NJ A2859 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2768
Note: Carry Foward to future A4726
Note: Carry Over of previous A1371
Note: Carry Over of previous S1655
Note: Carry Foward to future A4726
Note: Carry Over of previous A1371
Note: Carry Over of previous S1655
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-17 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-17 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transportation network companies to share information concerning sexual misconduct investigation of driver; authorizes transportation network company to ban drivers from accessing digital network during and following investigation.
Title
Requires transportation network companies to share information concerning sexual misconduct investigation of driver; authorizes transportation network company to ban drivers from accessing digital network during and following investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-17 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2859 (Carry Over) 2022-10-17 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A2859 (Carry Over) 2022-10-17 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1634 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1371 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1655 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2859 (Carry Over) 2022-10-17 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1634 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1371 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1655 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee