NJ A2854 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A687
Note: Carry Over of previous S2199
Note: Carry Over of previous S2199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies Community College Opportunity Grant Program to permit adult students enrolled in postsecondary career and technical education programs to receive financial assistance.
Title
Modifies Community College Opportunity Grant Program to permit adult students enrolled in postsecondary career and technical education programs to receive financial assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A687 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2199 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2882 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2199 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2882 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2854 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3000/2854_I1.HTM |