NJ A2761 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3442

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Substituted by S743 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to forgive certain student loans in the event of student borrower's death or total and permanent disability and grant deferment for temporary total disability.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to forgive certain student loans in the event of student borrower's death or total and permanent disability and grant deferment for temporary total disability.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-09-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-15AssemblySubstituted by S743 (1R)
2016-09-08AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3442 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S743 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.71.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback