NJ A2759 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A125
Note: Carry Over of previous A4551
Note: Carry Over of previous A4551
Note: Carry Over of previous A4551
Note: Carry Over of previous A4551
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires tuition bills of public institutions of higher education to include details on student fees and opt-out provision for student-managed entertainment fees, and requires certain institutions' websites to include student fee information.
Title
Requires tuition bills of public institutions of higher education to include details on student fees and opt-out provision for student-managed entertainment fees, and requires certain institutions' websites to include student fee information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2759 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4551 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S192 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A4551 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4551 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S192 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A4551 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A2759 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A3000/2759_I1.HTM |