NJ A2749 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2125
Note: Carry Over of previous A5190
Note: Carry Over of previous S3394
Note: Carry Over of previous A5190
Note: Carry Over of previous S3394
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires compliance with notice and approval process under MLUL for construction of free-standing structures on certain publicly-owned property.
Title
Requires compliance with notice and approval process under MLUL for construction of free-standing structures on certain publicly-owned property.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2749 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S272 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5190 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3394 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S272 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5190 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S3394 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2749 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2749_I1.HTM |