NJ A2721 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S1046 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S1046 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns alterations in child support obligations in response to changes to status of supported child.
Title
Concerns alterations in child support obligations in response to changes to status of supported child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S1046 (3R) |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeAngelo) |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1046 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.223.