NJ A2718 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2641
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes public-private alternative fueling station pilot program and requires DOT to conduct study.
Title
Establishes public-private alternative fueling station pilot program and requires DOT to conduct study.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S718 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2641 (Carry Over) 2016-10-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2641 (Carry Over) 2016-10-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee