NJ A2656 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1454
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Combined with A2444 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Combined with A2444 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for Medicaid coverage of comprehensive tobacco cessation services and prohibits certain restrictions on coverage.
Title
Provides for Medicaid coverage of comprehensive tobacco cessation services and prohibits certain restrictions on coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Combined with A2444 (ACS) |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1454 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2718 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2718 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee