NJ A265 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3374
Note: Carry Over of previous A2173
Note: Carry Over of previous S1489
Note: Carry Over of previous A2173
Note: Carry Over of previous S1489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides credits under corporation business tax and gross income tax for qualified wages of certain disabled veterans.
Title
Provides credits under corporation business tax and gross income tax for qualified wages of certain disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A265 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2173 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1571 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1489 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2173 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1571 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1489 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A265 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/265_I1.HTM |