NJ A2613 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4156
Note: Carry Over of previous A5405
Note: Carry Over of previous A5405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes civil action for damages for injury or death of certain animals in certain circumstances.
Title
Establishes civil action for damages for injury or death of certain animals in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S722 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S4156 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5405 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4156 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A5405 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2613 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2613_I1.HTM |