NJ A2597 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2359
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipality to establish restricted parking spaces for certain volunteer firefighters.
Title
Permits municipality to establish restricted parking spaces for certain volunteer firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S636 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2359 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A2359 (Carry Over) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee