NJ A259 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A724

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits application for PERS accidental disability benefit for injury sustained after January 2003 while employed at State psychiatric institution or correctional facility immediately prior to PERS membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits application for PERS accidental disability benefit for injury sustained after January 2003 while employed at State psychiatric institution or correctional facility immediately prior to PERS membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-14AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A724 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2915 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback