NJ A2578 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1321
Note: Carry Over of previous A3447
Note: Carry Over of previous A3447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires replacement of all electronic voting machines used in State by district-based optical scan voting systems by June 7, 2016; makes appropriation.
Title
Requires replacement of all electronic voting machines used in State by district-based optical scan voting systems by June 7, 2016; makes appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2578 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1385 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3447 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1385 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3447 (Carry Over) 2014-06-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A2578 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A3000/2578_I1.HTM |