NJ A2574 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S64 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S64 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students.
Title
Establishes measures to deter steroid use among students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted by S64 (1R) |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S64 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A2574 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3000/2574_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3000/2574_R1.HTM |