NJ A2565 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4712

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows NJ STARS and NJ STARS II scholarship recipients to maintain program eligibility in the event that medical condition or recent death of parent or spouse prevents enrollment as full-time student.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows NJ STARS and NJ STARS II scholarship recipients to maintain program eligibility in the event that medical condition or recent death of parent or spouse prevents enrollment as full-time student.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S888 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
2018-01-05SenateSubstituted for S888 (1R)
2017-12-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-12-11SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-12-11SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
2016-04-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-0)
2016-03-14AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Benson)
2016-02-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4712 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S888 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A2565 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback