NJ A2529 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-08 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-08 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns energy efficiency and renewable energy requirements. **
Title
Concerns energy efficiency and renewable energy requirements. **
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-06 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-06 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-08 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. | |
2011-12-05 | Passed by the Assembly (71-5-2) | |
2011-12-01 | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. | |
2011-12-01 | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only | |
2011-03-03 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly | |
2011-01-10 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-20-1) | |
2011-01-10 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Senate (25-12) | |
2011-01-10 | Substituted for S2306/2321 (SCS/1R) | |
2011-01-06 | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Smith) | |
2010-12-09 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee | |
2010-10-25 | Passed by the Assembly (56-17-5) | |
2010-09-20 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-20 | Recommitted to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee | |
2010-06-21 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chivukula) | |
2010-06-10 | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2306 (Same As) 2011-01-10 - Substituted by A2529 (ACS/4R)