NJ A2478 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3597
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain contractors to register under "The Public Works Contractor Registration Act."
Title
Requires certain contractors to register under "The Public Works Contractor Registration Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S62 |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S62 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.376.
A3597 (Carry Over) 2016-09-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3597 (Carry Over) 2016-09-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading