NJ A2467 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2870
Note: Carry Foward to future S1842
Note: Carry Foward to future S466
Note: Carry Foward to future A800
Note: Carry Over of previous S1193
Note: Carry Over of previous A1459
Note: Carry Foward to future S1842
Note: Carry Foward to future S466
Note: Carry Foward to future A800
Note: Carry Over of previous S1193
Note: Carry Over of previous A1459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for fair notice and opportunity to contest, or obtain waiver of a repayment of, overpayment of homestead rebate or credit and homestead property tax reimbursement.
Title
Provides for fair notice and opportunity to contest, or obtain waiver of a repayment of, overpayment of homestead rebate or credit and homestead property tax reimbursement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2467 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2467 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2467 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2467 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S1007 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1193 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1459 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A2467 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2467 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2467 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S1007 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1193 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1459 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2467 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2467_I1.HTM |