NJ A2323 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2186
Note: Carry Foward to future S2732
Note: Carry Over of previous A4155
Note: Carry Foward to future S2732
Note: Carry Over of previous A4155
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the restraint of prisoners during and immediately after childbirth.
Title
Prohibits the restraint of prisoners during and immediately after childbirth.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2323 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2323 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4155 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S221
S2371 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2323 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4155 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S221
S2371 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee