NJ A2255 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3537
Note: Carry Over of previous S1557
Note: Carry Over of previous S1557
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-11)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boards of education to ensure that all staff are trained in care of students with epilepsy and seizure disorders every two years.
Title
Requires boards of education to ensure that all staff are trained in care of students with epilepsy and seizure disorders every two years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3537 (Carry Over) 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1557 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2376 (Same As) 2024-09-30 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1557 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2376 (Same As) 2024-09-30 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2255 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2255_I1.HTM |