NJ A221 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2052
Note: Carry Foward to future A2556
Note: Carry Foward to future S1956
Note: Carry Over of previous A3848
Note: Carry Foward to future A2556
Note: Carry Foward to future S1956
Note: Carry Over of previous A3848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides civil service preference to military service members who did not serve in theater of operation but received campaign or expedition medal.
Title
Provides civil service preference to military service members who did not serve in theater of operation but received campaign or expedition medal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A221 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A221 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A221 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3848 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1583 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A221 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A221 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3848 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1583 (Same As) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A221 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/221_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A221 |