NJ A2200 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2696

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires water purveyors to conduct, and report to DEP, water loss audits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires water purveyors to conduct, and report to DEP, water loss audits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-10AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-19AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2696 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S642 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback