NJ A2196 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3080
Note: Carry Over of previous S3138
Note: Carry Over of previous S3138
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-02-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-02-10 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires outdoor lighting fixtures installed or replaced by, or on behalf of State, or at projects receiving State funds, to meet certain criteria.
Title
Requires outdoor lighting fixtures installed or replaced by, or on behalf of State, or at projects receiving State funds, to meet certain criteria.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchelle Drulis [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Roll Calls
2025-02-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3080 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S3138 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1610 (Same As) 2025-02-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3138 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1610 (Same As) 2025-02-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee