NJ A2188 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4439
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale and distribution of mercury relays and switches under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits sale and distribution of mercury relays and switches under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1496 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4439 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
A4439 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)