NJ A2184 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A963
Note: Carry Over of previous A2995
Note: Carry Over of previous A2995
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes central registry for sickle cell trait diagnoses; provides for informational outreach and genetic counseling.
Title
Establishes central registry for sickle cell trait diagnoses; provides for informational outreach and genetic counseling.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (63-4-4) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2184 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2995 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2086 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2995 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2086 (Same As) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading