NJ A2172 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3344
Note: Carry Foward to future S2139
Note: Carry Over of previous A4366
Note: Carry Foward to future S2139
Note: Carry Over of previous A4366
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain plenary winery licensees from filing requirements imposed on retail sellers of litter-generating products.
Title
Exempts certain plenary winery licensees from filing requirements imposed on retail sellers of litter-generating products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2172 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2172 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4366 (Carry Over) 2015-03-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S3394 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2172 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4366 (Carry Over) 2015-03-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S3394 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee