NJ A2162 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1873

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows person on police officer or firefighter eligible list who is unable to complete requirements for employment due to certain military service to have name placed on subsequent eligible list.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows person on police officer or firefighter eligible list who is unable to complete requirements for employment due to certain military service to have name placed on subsequent eligible list.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2018-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-05-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-12AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1873 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2450 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback