NJ A2162 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 3 2012 - 75% progression
Action: 2013-01-28 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases minimum wage to $8.50, then makes annual adjustments based on CPI increases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases minimum wage to $8.50, then makes annual adjustments based on CPI increases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-28SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2012-12-03AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (44-31-1)
2012-12-03AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2012-11-29SenatePassed by the Senate (23-16)
2012-11-29SenateMotion To Table (23-13) (Weinberg)
2012-11-29SenateMotion To Sa (Pennacchio)
2012-11-29SenateSubstituted for S3/853 (SCS/1R)
2012-11-19SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2012-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (46-33-0)
2012-03-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-01-30AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3 (Same As) 2012-11-29 - Substituted by A2162 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback