NJ A2157 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S855
Note: Carry Over of previous A277
Note: Carry Over of previous A277
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits board of chosen freeholders to change title to "board of county commissioners" and "freeholder" and "chosen freeholder" to "county commissioner"; requires county that changes terms to update website.
Title
Permits board of chosen freeholders to change title to "board of county commissioners" and "freeholder" and "chosen freeholder" to "county commissioner"; requires county that changes terms to update website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2157 (Carry Over) 2018-06-14 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A277 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S402 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A277 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S402 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A2157 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A2500/2157_I1.HTM |