NJ A2134 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4718
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Substituted by S120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Substituted by S120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes FY 2018 supplemental appropriation of $7,453,000 to DOH for family planning services.
Title
Makes FY 2018 supplemental appropriation of $7,453,000 to DOH for family planning services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted by S120 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4718 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S120 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - Approved P.L.2018, c.2.
S120 (Same As) 2018-02-21 - Approved P.L.2018, c.2.