NJ A211 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2192
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1832 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1832 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes loan redemption program and tuition reimbursement program for certain teachers of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.*
Title
Establishes loan redemption program and tuition reimbursement program for certain teachers of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.*
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S1832 (2R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2192 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1832 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.401.
S1832 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.401.