NJ A2097 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1447
Note: Carry Over of previous S429
Note: Carry Over of previous S429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for purchase and installation of electric vehicle charging stations and for commercial zero emission vehicle fleet conversions.
Title
Provides corporation business tax and gross income tax credits for purchase and installation of electric vehicle charging stations and for commercial zero emission vehicle fleet conversions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1447 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S429 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S210 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S429 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S210 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2097 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2097_I1.HTM |