NJ A2088 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3177
Note: Carry Over of previous A3177
Note: Carry Over of previous A3177
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Substituted by S855 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Substituted by S855 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of DCA to promulgate rules and regulations providing for veterans' affordable housing assistance preference.
Title
Requires Commissioner of DCA to promulgate rules and regulations providing for veterans' affordable housing assistance preference.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S855 (1R) |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3177 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S855 (Same As) 2016-08-01 - Approved P.L.2016, c.19.
A3177 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S855 (Same As) 2016-08-01 - Approved P.L.2016, c.19.
A3177 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee