NJ A2017 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1831
Note: Carry Over of previous A5215
Note: Carry Over of previous S3671
Note: Carry Over of previous A5215
Note: Carry Over of previous S3671
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid Fraud Division to enter into data sharing agreement upon request of county to provide access to third party insurance liability data regarding certain COVID-19 related health claims.
Title
Requires Medicaid Fraud Division to enter into data sharing agreement upon request of county to provide access to third party insurance liability data regarding certain COVID-19 related health claims.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Erik Peterson [R] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2022-10-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2022-09-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2017 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5215 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3671 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5215 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3671 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee