NJ A2015 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the four-year "New Jersey Innovation Inspiration School Grant Pilot Program" in DOE to fund non-traditional STEM programs.*
Title
Establishes the four-year "New Jersey Innovation Inspiration School Grant Pilot Program" in DOE to fund non-traditional STEM programs.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2012-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-26-2) |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2562 (Same As) 2013-02-21 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee