NJ A2002 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4531
Note: Carry Over of previous S3521
Note: Carry Over of previous S3521
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage of standard fertility preservation services for individuals with certain menstrual disorders resulting in infertility.
Title
Requires health insurance coverage of standard fertility preservation services for individuals with certain menstrual disorders resulting in infertility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4531 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3521 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2870 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3521 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2870 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2002 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2002_I1.HTM |