NJ A20 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits person whose driver's license is suspended for DWI from operating NJT train.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits person whose driver's license is suspended for DWI from operating NJT train.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27AssemblySubstituted by S20
2016-06-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-02AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S20 (Same As) 2016-08-31 - Approved P.L.2016, c.33.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback