NJ A1997 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4684
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S775 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S775 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Tuition and Aid Grant Study Commission to examine New Jersey's Tuition Aid Grant Program and make recommendations regarding improvements to program.
Title
Establishes Tuition and Aid Grant Study Commission to examine New Jersey's Tuition Aid Grant Program and make recommendations regarding improvements to program.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S775 (2R) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4684 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S775 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.298.
S775 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.298.