NJ A1971 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2584
Note: Carry Foward to future S1389
Note: Carry Over of previous A5448
Note: Carry Over of previous S1257
Note: Carry Foward to future S1389
Note: Carry Over of previous A5448
Note: Carry Over of previous S1257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S332 (6R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S332 (6R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification to consumers of collection and disclosure of personal data by certain entities.
Title
Requires notification to consumers of collection and disclosure of personal data by certain entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S332 (6R) |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1971 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S332 (6R)
A1971 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S332 (6R)
A5448 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1257 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S332 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.266.
A1971 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by S332 (6R)
A5448 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1257 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S332 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.266.