NJ A1952 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Out-of-network Consumer Protection, Transparency, Cost Containment and Accountability Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Out-of-network Consumer Protection, Transparency, Cost Containment and Accountability Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio)
2016-10-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-06-20AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4444 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
S1285 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback