NJ A1949 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4389
Note: Carry Over of previous A4389
Note: Carry Over of previous A4389
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-13 - Combined with A4118/1694 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-13 - Combined with A4118/1694 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain breweries to sell beer at community farm markets.
Title
Permits certain breweries to sell beer at community farm markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Combined with A4118/1694 (ACS) |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4389 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1334 (Same As) 2016-12-12 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4389 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1334 (Same As) 2016-12-12 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4389 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee