NJ A1930 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4807
Note: Carry Over of previous S720
Note: Carry Over of previous S720
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-12 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens statute that criminalizes cyber-harassment of minor.
Title
Broadens statute that criminalizes cyber-harassment of minor.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Park [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Victoria Flynn [R] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-09-12 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4807 (Carry Over) 2022-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S720 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1142 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S720 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1142 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee