NJ A1888 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2336
Note: Carry Over of previous A2126
Note: Carry Over of previous A2126
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DEP to establish pollinator habitat program for closed landfills.
Title
Directs DEP to establish pollinator habitat program for closed landfills.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Rep. Shama Haider [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1888 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2126 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2126 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading