NJ A1768 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1894
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs State agencies to take certain actions to expedite permitting through use of general permits and permits-by-rule. *
Title
Directs State agencies to take certain actions to expedite permitting through use of general permits and permits-by-rule. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1894 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S482 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S482 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading