NJ A1730 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3377
Note: Carry Over of previous A2009
Note: Carry Over of previous A2009
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for awarding of design-build contracts.
Title
Establishes procedures for awarding of design-build contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1730 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2009 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S693 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2009 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S693 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee