NJ A172 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2536
Note: Carry Over of previous S538
Note: Carry Over of previous S538
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows long term tax exemption extension for certain low-income housing.
Title
Allows long term tax exemption extension for certain low-income housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Erik Peterson [R] |
Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2536 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S538 (3R)
S538 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.297.
S538 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.297.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A172 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/172_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/172_I2.HTM |