NJ A1670 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4707

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Office of Student Loan Ombudsman; regulates student loan servicers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Office of Student Loan Ombudsman; regulates student loan servicers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3198 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-2)
2018-01-05SenateSubstituted for S3198 (1R)
2017-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-11-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-11-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
2017-06-08AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (56-9-11)
2016-02-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4707 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3198 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A1670 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback