NJ A1664 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5448
Note: Carry Over of previous S1944
Note: Carry Over of previous S1944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bars the disclosure of personal identifying information of grand jury witnesses except for name; creates a fourth degree offense for attorney disclosure.
Title
Bars the disclosure of personal identifying information of grand jury witnesses except for name; creates a fourth degree offense for attorney disclosure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5448 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1061 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1944 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1061 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1944 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1664 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2000/1664_I1.HTM |