NJ A1663 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1735
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1735
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain public facilities and offices to provide on-site lactation room; DOH to provide information about lactation room availability; and DOE to provide information on lactation policies in schools.
Title
Requires certain public facilities and offices to provide on-site lactation room; DOH to provide information about lactation room availability; and DOE to provide information on lactation policies in schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S1735 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4111 (Carry Over) 2016-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1735 (Same As) 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.242.
S1735 (Same As) 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.242.