NJ A1646 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S515
Note: Carry Foward to future A1668
Note: Carry Foward to future A1047
Note: Carry Over of previous A1746
Note: Carry Over of previous S3600
Note: Carry Foward to future A1668
Note: Carry Foward to future A1047
Note: Carry Over of previous A1746
Note: Carry Over of previous S3600
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Security Deposit Assistance Pilot Program" in Passaic, Union, Essex, Hudson, Gloucester, Atlantic, Camden, and Mercer counties, appropriates $400,000.
Title
Establishes "Security Deposit Assistance Pilot Program" in Passaic, Union, Essex, Hudson, Gloucester, Atlantic, Camden, and Mercer counties, appropriates $400,000.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1646 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1646 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1646 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1746 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1471 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3600 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1646 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1646 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1746 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1471 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3600 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading